+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 26 March 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 105 Nay: 13
- Engrossed on Friday, 17 February 2012
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_HB2469_H_4048
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 17, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor