+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, May 9, 2022
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 6, 2022
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, April 28, 2022
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 109 Nay: 10
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report now available
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 29 Nay: 6
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Huebert, Representative Thomas and Representative Stogsdill appointed as second conferees
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as second conferees
- Conference committee report now available
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as conferees
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Huebert , Representative Thomas and Representative Stogsdill as conferees
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 11
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 115 Nay: 4
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations and re-referred to Committee of the Whole
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 1, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 25, 2022, 1:30 PM Room 218-N
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction on Wednesday, January 5, 2022
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor