+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 18, 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Monday, 14 May 2012
On May 11, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Patton and Representative Pauls as conferees
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 05, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Monday, 20 February 2012
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 30, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2012_HB2464_S_5266
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
CR_2012_HB2464_S_4835
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_HB2464_H_3963
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 11, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 30, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 20, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 21, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor