+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 13, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, February 19, 2020
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 9
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development
Type:
Primary Sponsor