+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, March 24 , 2016
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, March 22, 2016
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 03, 2016, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, January 25, 2016, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2016_HB2454_S_3851
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
CR_2016_HB2454_H_3074
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
Type:
Primary Sponsor