+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, 12 May 2014
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 06, 2014
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 116 Nay: 7
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend joint rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted.
- Conference committee report now available
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator King, Senator Smith and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Bruchman and Representative Pauls as conferees
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 18, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 112-N
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CCR_2014_HB2448_S_4484
Motion to suspend joint rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted.
CR_2014_HB2448_H_3197
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (4)
April 30, 2014: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 5, 2014: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 25, 2014: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed
February 21, 2014: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor