+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 09 March 2012
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 02, 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On February 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 21, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 152-S
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
On January 19, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 783 Docking
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 13, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor