+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Health and Human Services
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2014_HB2435_H_3240
Died on Calendar
CR_2014_HB2435_H_3889
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Health and Human Services
Type:
Primary Sponsor