+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 21, 2012
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 16 May 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 111 Nay: 5
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 20, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, January 03, 2012
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2427_S_4723
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_HB2427_H_4055
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 15, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor