+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Reconsider Failed Yea: 19 Nay: 21
- Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 19 Nay: 21
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 22
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Suellentrop
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Denning was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Denning
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 14, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 117 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Thursday, February 22, 2018
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Elliott was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Elliott
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Helgerson was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Helgerson
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ralph was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ralph
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, April 05, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 112-N
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (8)
FA_2018_HB2419_S_3923
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
FA_2018_HB2419_S_3919
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Denning was adopted
FA_2018_HB2419_S_3929
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Suellentrop was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 22
CR_2018_HB2419_S_3818
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2018_HB2419_H_3512
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Helgerson was adopted
FA_2018_HB2419_H_3499
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Elliott was rejected
FA_2018_HB2419_H_3500
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ralph was adopted
CR_2017_HB2419_H_2006
Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ralph
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor