+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 21, 2012
On May 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Wednesday, 16 May 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 116 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 4
- Engrossed on Friday, 17 February 2012
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 18, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 9, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Introduced
- Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, November 17, 2011
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2012_HB2413_H_3755
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2012_HB2413_S_4627
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2012_HB2413_H_4069
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2012: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 17, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Post Audit Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor