+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
On May 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Reapportionment
On May 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Reapportionment
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 79 Nay: 42
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Dillmore was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Dillmore
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, April 29, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 29, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2012_HB2396_H_4519
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Dillmore was rejected
CR_2011_HB2396_H_2839
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
+ − Vote
March 7, 2012: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor