+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 35 Nay: 3
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 117 Nay: 2
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 152 - S
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2013_HB2387_H_1834
Committee of the Whole - Be passed
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2014: Emergency Final Action - Passed
March 26, 2013: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor