+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Motion to concur with amendments failed; Yea: 43 Nay: 72
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Ostmeyer was rejected
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Schodorf was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Owens
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Ostmeyer
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Schodorf
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected Yea: 8 Nay: 28
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Abrams
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was rejected Yea: 19 Nay: 21
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Emler
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Emler was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 21 Nay: 19
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Reapportionment
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Reapportionment
On January 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 16 March 2011
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 7
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 08, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (8)
FA_2012_HB2371_S_5472
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Emler was adopted
FA_2012_HB2371_S_5463
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Abrams was rejected Yea: 19 Nay: 21
FA_2012_HB2371_S_5444
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was rejected Yea: 8 Nay: 28
FA_2012_HB2371_S_5457
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Ostmeyer was rejected
FA_2012_HB2371_S_5447
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Owens was adopted
FA_2012_HB2371_S_5448
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Schodorf was adopted
CR_2011_HB2371_H_1865
Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
CR_2012_HB2371_S_5433
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
+ − Votes (5)
May 2, 2012: Motion to concur with amendments failed
March 16, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor