+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 70 Nay: 54
- Engrossed on Monday, 12 March 2012
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Knox
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Knox
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted Yea: 93 Nay: 23
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Knox
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Knox
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted
- Motion by Rep. Mah to re-refer to Committee on Federal and State Affairs failed.
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Mah
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Mah was rejected Yea: 44 Nay: 71
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Smith
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (7)
FA_2012_HB2353_H_4351
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Mah was rejected Yea: 44 Nay: 71
FA_2012_HB2353_H_4581
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Smith was adopted
FA_2012_HB2353_H_4518
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted
FA_2012_HB2353_H_4511
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted
FA_2012_HB2353_H_4524
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted
FA_2012_HB2353_H_4526
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Knox was adopted Yea: 93 Nay: 23
CR_2012_HB2353_H_3974
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor