+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 16 April 2013
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 12, 2013
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 118 Nay: 2
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Abrams, Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley appointed as conferees
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kelley , Representative Cassidy and Representative Trimmer as conferees
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 4
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 27 February 2013
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 20, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2013_HB2349_H_1207
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2013_HB2349_S_1702
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
April 5, 2013: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 21, 2013: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 28, 2013: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor