+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Thursday, 31 March 2011
- Engrossed on Monday, 14 March 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 21, 2011, 12:00 PM Room 548-S
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 7
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 08, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
FA_2011_HB2339_H_1852
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed
March 14, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor