+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 29 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 02, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
- Engrossed on Thursday, 02 February 2012
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 07, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2011_HB2335_H_1960
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Passed
February 2, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor