+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Reapportionment
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Reapportionment
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 24 February 2011
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 110 Nay: 11
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Brookens
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2012_HB2329_S_5489
Died on Senate General Orders
FA_2011_HB2329_H_1470
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was rejected
CR_2011_HB2329_H_1477
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Vote
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor