+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 May 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 14, 2012
On May 9, 2012 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Wednesday, 09 May 2012
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 115 Nay: 9
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 15, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
On March 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 112 Nay: 6
- Engrossed on Friday, 17 February 2012
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 08, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2324_S_5423
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_HB2324_H_4001
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2012: Concurred with amendments
May 3, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 17, 2012: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor