+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 8, 2021
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 29, 2021
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 548-S
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Utilities
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
- Engrossed on Monday, March 1, 2021
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 582-N
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
- Introduced
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor