+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 21, 2012
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 25 May 2012
On May 17, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 17 May 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 94 Nay: 22
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report now available
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 2
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator V. Schmidt
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator King
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 4
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 01, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 21, 2011, 12:00 PM Room 548-S
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 113 Nay: 10
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, February 18, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (5)
CCR_2012_HB2318_S_5353
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
FA_2012_HB2318_S_5153
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was adopted
CR_2012_HB2318_S_4544
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
FA_2012_HB2318_S_5173
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator V. Schmidt was adopted
CR_2011_HB2318_H_1481
Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (4)
May 14, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 10, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
March 14, 2011: Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor