+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 17 May 2012
On May 14, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 14, 2012
On May 10, 2012 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Thursday, 10 May 2012
On May 9, 2012 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference committee report now available
On March 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kinzer , Representative Patton and Representative Pauls as conferees
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 28 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CCR_2012_HB2313_S_5344
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
CR_2012_HB2313_H_4031
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 3, 2012: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 21, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor