+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 19 May 2011
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 13, 2011
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, 25 February 2011
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Thursday, 05 May 2011
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 110 Nay: 14
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report now available
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 35 Nay: 3
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Owens, Senator King and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Colloton , Representative Kinzer and Representative McCray-Miller as conferees
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 2
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Love was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Love
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 23, 2011, 1:15 PM Room 144-S
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Brookens
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Colloton
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 65 Nay: 54
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, February 18, 2011, 2:00 PM Room 144-S
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (7)
FA_2011_HB2312_S_2522
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Love was adopted
CCR_2011_HB2312_S_2735
Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
FA_2011_HB2312_H_1673
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
CR_2011_HB2312_S_2375
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2011_HB2312_H_1669
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Brookens was adopted
FA_2011_HB2312_H_1674
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Colloton was adopted
CR_2011_HB2312_H_1601
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
May 2, 2011: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 29, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 25, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor