+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
- Reengrossed on Tuesday, March 27, 2018
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Motion to reconsider amendment by Representative Wheeler adopted. Upon reconsideration, motion to amend was rejected.
- Engrossed on Monday, March 26, 2018
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Weber
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Weber was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Wheeler
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wheeler was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 14, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 29, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 27, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
FA_2018_HB2308_H_3771
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Weber was adopted
FA_2018_HB2308_H_3800
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Wheeler was adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor