+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Monday, April 18, 2022
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022
- Reengrossed on Sunday, April 3, 2022
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 110 Nay: 3
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley appointed as conferees
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Patton , Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael as conferees
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Senator Hilderbrand raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 17, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, February 22, 2022
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 119 Nay: 2
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Fairchild was rejected Yea: 35 Nay: 84
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Fairchild
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Burris was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Burris
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Patton was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Patton
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, January 21, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 20, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 15, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor