+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 08, 2012, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 22 February 2012
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 101 Nay: 22
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Meier was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Meier
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Arpke
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Arpke was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 02, 2012, 9:00 AM Room 783 Docking
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 783 DSOB
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 783 DSOB
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 21, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 783 DSOB
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Friday, February 18, 2011, 9:00 AM Room 783 DSOB
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
FA_2012_HB2295_H_4303
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Arpke was adopted
FA_2012_HB2295_H_4313
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Meier was adopted
CR_2012_HB2295_H_4111
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Vote
February 22, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor