+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 24 February 2011
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 15, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 88 Nay: 33
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Goodman
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Goodman was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Siegfreid
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Siegfreid was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (4)
FA_2011_HB2294_H_1604
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Siegfreid was rejected
FA_2011_HB2294_H_1629
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was withdrawn
CR_2011_HB2294_H_1442
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2011_HB2294_H_1605
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Goodman was rejected
+ − Vote
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Local Government
Type:
Primary Sponsor