+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 1, 2012 in the House:
- Died in Committee
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Insurance
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Insurance; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 152-S
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor