+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Died on Calendar
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative McPherson
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be rejected Yea: 54 Nay: 69
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed Yea: 19 Nay: 103
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed Yea: 44 Nay: 78
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Grosserode was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Grosserode
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative McPherson was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Houser
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Houser was rejected Yea: 27 Nay: 89
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Scapa
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Scapa was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hedke
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hedke was adopted Yea: 62 Nay: 58
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Education
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 23, 2015, 1:00 PM Room 112N
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (7)
FA_2016_HB2292_H_4161
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Grosserode was adopted
FA_2016_HB2292_H_4175
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Scapa was rejected
FA_2016_HB2292_H_4195
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hedke was adopted Yea: 62 Nay: 58
FA_2016_HB2292_H_4160
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative McPherson was adopted
FA_2016_HB2292_H_4162
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Houser was rejected Yea: 27 Nay: 89
CR_2016_HB2292_H_4099
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
CR_2016_HB2292_H_3484
Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Education
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor