+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 1
- Engrossed on Wednesday, March 22, 2017
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Rereferred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions; Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 281-N
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2017_HB2289_H_1411
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
Type:
Primary Sponsor