+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, April 15, 2022
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 80 Nay: 34
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Hilderbrand, Senator Gossage and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Landwehr , Representative Eplee and Representative Ruiz, S. as conferees
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 30 Nay: 7
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed Yea: 14 Nay: 22
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Wilborn was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Wilborn
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, March 4, 2021
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Bergquist was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Bergquist
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Type:
Primary Sponsor