+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 1, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, February 26, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 116 Nay: 8
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Probst was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Probst
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 18, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 546-S
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor