+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 77 Nay: 48
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Water and Environment
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 582-N - CANCELLED
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 582-N
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Water and Environment
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2017_HB2272_H_1094
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Water and Environment
Type:
Primary Sponsor