+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 22 May 2013
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 17, 2013
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Friday, 10 May 2013
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 119 Nay: 1
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 3
- Conference committee report now available
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Abrams, Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley appointed as conferees
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kelley , Representative Cassidy and Representative Trimmer as conferees
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2013, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 0
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, 20 February 2013
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 13, 2013, 1:25 PM Room 112-N
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CCR_2013_HB2261_S_2236
Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 36 Nay: 3
CR_2013_HB2261_S_1915
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2013_HB2261_H_1124
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2013: Conference Committee Report was adopted
April 4, 2013: Conference Committee Report was adopted
March 26, 2013: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 25, 2013: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Education
Type:
Primary Sponsor