+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate General Orders
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, January 24, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 142-S
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 72 Nay: 52
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Elections
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 281-N
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2018_HB2256_S_3007
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
CR_2017_HB2256_S_1661
Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
CR_2017_HB2256_H_1193
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Elections
Type:
Primary Sponsor