+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 118 Nay: 6
- Engrossed on Tuesday, February 26, 2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor