+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 21, 2021
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, April 9, 2021
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
- Conference committee report now available
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative S. Johnson , Representative Croft and Representative Neighbor as conferees
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Longbine, Senator Fagg and Senator Pittman appointed as conferees
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 11, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance and Pensions
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 8, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 218-N
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance and Pensions
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Insurance and Pensions
Type:
Primary Sponsor