+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 22, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finch was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Finch
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 15, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 112-N
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2017_HB2240_S_1663
Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
FA_2017_HB2240_H_1291
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Finch was adopted
CR_2017_HB2240_H_1167
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor