+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, May 5, 2022
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 29, 2022
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed on Wednesday, April 27, 2022
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 109 Nay: 12
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 3
- Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
On April 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report now available
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Hilderbrand and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as conferees
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Kelly , Representative Hoheisel and Representative Xu as conferees
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
- Senator Pittman raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson
- Senator Pittman raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 32 Nay: 5
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 107 Nay: 16
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 15, 2021, 9:00 AM Room 218-N
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Financial Institutions and Rural Development
Type:
Primary Sponsor