+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 11, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, February 15, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
FA_2011_HB2227_S_2379
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected
+ − Votes (2)
March 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed
February 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor