+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, 24 February 2011
- Reengrossed on Thursday, 31 March 2011
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Friday, 08 April 2011
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 01, 2011
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 94 Nay: 28
- Substitute motion by Rep. Loganbill to nonconcur failed. 23 Yeas: 99 Nays
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator King
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 25
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 26
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 15
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, March 22, 2011, 12:00 PM Room 346-S
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 18, 2011, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 17, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 91 Nay: 30
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Mah was rejected
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Mah
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Patton
- Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Wednesday, February 16, 2011, 1:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (9)
FA_2011_HB2218_S_2425
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 25
FA_2011_HB2218_S_2450
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected Yea: 13 Nay: 26
FA_2011_HB2218_S_2451
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
FA_2011_HB2218_S_2420
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was adopted
FA_2011_HB2218_S_2424
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
FA_2011_HB2218_S_2427
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
FA_2011_HB2218_H_1595
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kinzer was adopted
FA_2011_HB2218_H_1611
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Mah was rejected
CR_2011_HB2218_H_1476
Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar
+ − Votes (5)
March 29, 2011: Concurred with amendments
March 23, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
February 24, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor