+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 34 Nay: 83
- Motion to reconsider on Emergency Final Action adopted.
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 28 February 2012
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 122 Nay: 2
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was adopted
- Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 24, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 783 Docking
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Taxation
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2012_HB2212_H_3831
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
FA_2012_HB2212_H_4410
Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was adopted
+ − Votes (2)
February 29, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Not passed
February 23, 2012: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor