+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Will become law without Governor's signature
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 9, 2019
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed on Friday, April 5, 2019
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 84 Nay: 39
- Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed Yea: 40 Nay: 83
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 28 Nay: 12
- Conference committee report now available
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Cox and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Billinger and Senator Ware appointed as second conferees
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Olson, Senator Billinger and Senator Ware appointed as conferees
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Vickrey , Representative Cox and Representative Neighbor as conferees
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Insurance
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 18, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Insurance
Type:
Primary Sponsor