+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 22, 2021
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
On April 9, 2021 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 2
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 34 Nay: 4
- Conference committee report now available
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Hilderbrand, Senator Gossage and Senator Pettey appointed as conferees
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Landwehr , Representative Eplee and Representative Parker as conferees
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 19, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed on Thursday, March 4, 2021
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Health and Human Services
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 11, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 112-N
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
- Introduced
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Type:
Primary Sponsor