+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 29 March 2012
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 23, 2012
On March 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
On March 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On March 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 02, 2012, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 89 Nay: 35
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, January 26, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendment
CR_2012_HB2207_H_3965
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
February 15, 2012: Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Judiciary
Type:
Primary Sponsor