+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 10 April 2013
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 05, 2013
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed on Monday, 01 April 2013
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Wednesday, March 13, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
- Hearing: Friday, March 15, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 159-S CANCELLED
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Friday, March 15, 2013, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 14, 2013, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2013_HB2207_H_1042
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2013_HB2207_S_1941
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2013: Concurred with amendments
March 27, 2013: Final Action - Substitute passed as amended
February 26, 2013: Final Action - Substitute passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor