+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Wednesday, 16 April 2014
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 08, 2014
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 94 Nay: 30
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Abrams, Senator Arpke and Senator Hensley appointed as conferees
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Brunk , Representative Couture-Lovelady and Representative Ruiz as conferees
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 12
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2014, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 69 Nay: 53
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 26 March 2013
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 14, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 346-S
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Education; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (3)
CR_2014_HB2197_S_3631
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
CR_2014_HB2197_S_3434
Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to
CR_2013_HB2197_H_1890
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2014: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 6, 2014: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
March 26, 2013: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Federal and State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor