+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Died in Senate Committee
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Thursday, March 10, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Final Action - Passed; Yea: 119 Nay: 0
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 14, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Vote
February 25, 2011: Final Action - Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice
Type:
Primary Sponsor