+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 1, 2011 in the House:
- Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 May 2011
On May 12, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed on Tuesday, 01 March 2011
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Reengrossed on Tuesday, 03 May 2011
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 06, 2011
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 99 Nay: 20
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion to accede adopted; Senator Reitz, Senator Kelsey and Senator Faust-Goudeau appointed as 1 conferees
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Representative Huebert , Representative Mah and Representative Seiwert as conferees
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing: Monday, March 14, 2011, 9:30 AM Room 159-S
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received and Introduced
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 5
- Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Local Government
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Monday, February 21, 2011, 2:30 PM Room 346-S
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing: Thursday, February 17, 2011, 3:30 PM Room 144-S
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced
+ − Amendments (2)
CR_2011_HB2195_H_1593
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
CR_2011_HB2195_S_1986
Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2011: Concurred with amendments in conference
March 23, 2011: Final Action - Passed as amended
February 25, 2011: Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Local Government
Type:
Primary Sponsor